, Alekos
MARKIDIS 6.6%
note: Mehmet Ali TALAT becomes "president" of north Cyprus, 24 April
2005, after "presidential" elections on 17 April 2005; results -
Mehmet Ali TALAT 55.6%, Dervis EROGLU 22.7%; Ferdi Sabit SOYER is
"prime minister"; there is a Council of Ministers (cabinet) in north
Cyprus, appointed by the "prime minister"
Czech Republic
chief of state: President Vaclav KLAUS (since 7 March
2003)
note: the Czech Republic's first president Vaclav HAVEL stepped down
from office on 2 February 2003 having served exactly 10 years;
parliament finally elected a successor on 28 February 2003 after two
inconclusive elections in January 2003
head of government: Prime Minister Jiri PAROUBEK (since 25 April
2005), Deputy Prime Ministers Zdenek SKROMACH (since 4 August 2004),
Martin JAHN (since 4 August 2004), Pavel NEMEC (since 4 August
2004), Milan SIMONOVSKY (since 4 August 2004)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president on the recommendation of
the prime minister
elections: president elected by Parliament for a five-year term;
last successful election held 28 February 2003 (after earlier
elections held 15 and 24 January 2003 were inconclusive; next
election to be held January 2008); prime minister appointed by the
president
election results: Vaclav KLAUS elected president on 28 February
2003; Vaclav KLAUS 142 votes, Jan SOKOL 124 votes (third round;
combined votes of both chambers of parliament)
Denmark
chief of state: Queen MARGRETHE II (since 14 January 1972);
Heir Apparent Crown Prince FREDERIK, elder son of the monarch (born
26 May 1968)
head of government: Prime Minister Anders Fogh RASMUSSEN (since 27
November 2001)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the prime minister and approved by
parliament
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; following legislative
elections, the leader of the majority party or the leader of the
majority coalition is usually appointed prime minister by the monarch
Dhekelia
chief of state: Queen Elizabeth II (since 6 February 1952)
head of government: Administrator Maj. Gen. Peter Tomas Clayton
PEARSON (since 9 May 2003); note - reports to the British Ministry
of Defence
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; the administrator is
appointed by the monarch
Djibouti
chief of state: President Ismail Omar GUELLEH (since 8 May
1999)
head of government: Prime Minister Mohamed Dileita
|