d assumed the duties of acting prime minister in 1996, when
former Prime Minister TOFILAU Eti Alesana resigned in poor health;
TUILA'EPA was confirmed as prime minister (November 1998) after
TOFILAU died; Deputy Prime Minister MISA Telefoni (since 2001)
cabinet: Cabinet consists of 12 members, appointed by the chief of
state on the prime minister's advice
elections: upon the death of Chief Tanumafili II MALIETOA, a new
chief of state will be elected by the Legislative Assembly to serve
a five-year term; following legislative elections, the leader of the
majority party is usually appointed prime minister by the chief of
state with the approval of the Legislative Assembly
San Marino
chief of state: cochiefs of state Captain Regent Claudio
MUCCIOLI and Captain Regent Antonello BACCIOCHI (for the period 1
October 2005 - 31 March 2006)
head of government: Secretary of State for Foreign and Political
Affairs Fabio BERARDI (15 December 2003)
cabinet: Congress of State elected by the Great and General Council
for a five-year term
elections: cochiefs of state (captains regent) elected by the Great
and General Council for a six-month term; election last held NA
September 2005 (next to be held March 2006); secretary of state for
foreign and political affairs elected by the Great and General
Council for a five-year term; election last held 13 December 2003
(next to be held June 2006 when general elections are scheduled)
election results: Claudio MUCCIOLI and Antonello BACCIOCHI elected
captains regent; percent of legislative vote - NA%; Fabio BERARDI
elected secretary of state for foreign and political affairs;
percent of legislative vote - NA%
note: the popularly elected parliament (Grand and General Council)
selects two of its members to serve as the Captains Regent (cochiefs
of state) for a six-month period; they preside over meetings of the
Grand and General Council and its cabinet (Congress of State), which
has 10 other members, all selected by the Grand and General Council;
assisting the captains regent are 10 secretaries of state; the
secretary of state for Foreign Affairs has assumed some of the
prerogatives of a prime minister
Sao Tome and Principe
chief of state: President Fradique DE MENEZES
(since 3 September 2001)
head of government: Prime Minister Maria do Carmo SILVEIRA (since 7
June 2005); Damiao Vaz DE ALMEIDA resigned 2 June 2005
|