of government
head of government: President Svetozar MAROVIC (since 7 March 2003);
note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
cabinet: Federal Ministries act as Cabinet
elections: president elected by the parliament for a four-year term;
election last held 7 March 2003 (next to be held 2007)
election results: Svetozar MAROVIC elected president by the
parliament; vote was Svetozar MAROVIC 65, other 47
Seychelles
chief of state: President James MICHEL (since 14 April
2004); note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
head of government: President James MICHEL (since 14 April 2004);
note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the president
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 31 August-2 September 2001 (next to be held NA
2006)
election results: France Albert RENE re-elected president; percent
of vote - France Albert RENE (SPPF) 54.19%, Wavel RAMKALAWAN (UO)
44.95%, Philippe BOULLE 0.86%; note - the first time that
presidential elections have been held separately from legislative
elections; France Albert RENE stepped down 14 April 2004 and Vice
President James MICHEL was sworn in as president
Sierra Leone
chief of state: President Ahmad Tejan KABBAH (since 29
March 1996, reinstated 10 March 1998); note - the president is both
the chief of state and head of government
head of government: President Ahmad Tejan KABBAH (since 29 March
1996, reinstated 10 March 1998); note - the president is both the
chief of state and head of government
cabinet: Ministers of State appointed by the president with the
approval of the House of Representatives; the cabinet is responsible
to the president
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 14 May 2002 (next to be held May 2007); note -
president's tenure of office is limited to two five-year terms
election results: Ahmad Tejan KABBAH reelected president; percent of
vote - Ahmad Tejan KABBAH (SLPP) 70.6%, Ernest KOROMA (APC) 22.4%
Singapore
chief of state: President Sellapan Rama (S. R.) NATHAN
(since 1 September 1999)
head of government: Prime Minister LEE Hsien Loong (since 12 August
2004); Senior Minister GOH Chok Tong (since 12 August 2004);
Minister Mentor LEE Kuan Yew (sinc
|