ction last held 17 October 2003 (next to be held NA 2008)
election results: President Maumoon Abdul GAYOOM reelected in
referendum held 17 October 2003; percent of popular vote - Maumoon
Abdul GAYOOM 90.3%
Mali
chief of state: President Amadou Toumani TOURE (since 8 June
2002)
head of government: Prime Minister Ousmane Issoufi MAIGA (since 30
April 2004)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the prime minister
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term
(two-term limit); election last held 12 May 2002 (next to be held
May 2007); prime minister appointed by the president
election results: Amadou Toumani TOURE elected president; percent of
vote - Amadou Toumani TOURE 64.4%, Soumaila CISSE 35.6%
Malta
chief of state: President Eddie FENECH ADAMI (since 4 April
2004)
head of government: Prime Minister Lawrence GONZI (since 23 March
2004)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president on the advice of the
prime minister
elections: president elected by the House of Representatives for a
five-year term; election last held 29 March 2004 (next to be held by
April 2009); following legislative elections, the leader of the
majority party or leader of a majority coalition is usually
appointed prime minister by the president for a five-year term; the
deputy prime minister is appointed by the president on the advice of
the prime minister
election results: Eddie FENECH ADAMI elected president; percent of
House of Representatives vote - 33 out of 65 votes
Man, Isle of
chief of state: Lord of Mann Queen ELIZABETH II (since
6 February 1952), represented by Lieutenant Governor Ian MACFADYEN
(since 26 October 2002)
head of government: Chief Minister Donald GELLING (since 14 December
2004)
cabinet: Council of Ministers
elections: the monarch is hereditary; lieutenant governor appointed
by the monarch for a five-year term; the Chief Minister is elected
by the Tynwald; election last held 14 December 2004 (next to be held
December 2010)
election results: Donald GELLING elected chief minister by the
Tynwald; note - Richard CORKILL resigned 2 December 2004
Marshall Islands
chief of state: President Kessai Hesa NOTE (since 5
January 2004); note - the president is both the chief of state and
head of government
head of government: President Kessai Hesa NOTE (since 5 January
2004); note - the president is both the chie
|