e chief
minister, three other ministers, the attorney general, and the
finance secretary
elections: the monarch is hereditary; governor appointed by the
monarch; following legislative elections, the leader of the majority
party usually becomes chief minister
Morocco
chief of state: King MOHAMED VI (since 30 July 1999)
head of government: Prime Minister Driss JETTOU (since 9 October
2002)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the monarch
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; prime minister appointed
by the monarch following legislative elections
Mozambique
chief of state: President Armando GUEBUZA (since 2
February 2005)
head of government: Prime Minister Luisa DIOGO (since 17 February
2004)
cabinet: Cabinet
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 1-2 December 2004 (next to be held December
2009); prime minister appointed by the president
election results: Armando GUEBUZA elected president; percent of vote
- Armando GUEBUZA 63.7%, Afonso DHLAKAMA 31.7%
Namibia
chief of state: President Hifikepunye POHAMBA (since 15
November 2004)
head of government: Prime Minister Nahas ANGULA (since 21 March 2005)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president from among the members
of the National Assembly
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 15 November 2004 (next to be held November 2009)
election results: Hifikepunye POHAMBA elected president; percent of
vote - NA%
Nauru
chief of state: President Ludwig SCOTTY (since 26 October
2004); note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
head of government: President Ludwig SCOTTY (since 26 October 2004);
note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president from among the members
of Parliament
elections: president elected by Parliament for a three-year term;
election last held 23 October 2004 (next to be held NA 2007)
election results: Ludwig SCOTTY was unopposed in the parliamentary
elections for president
Nepal
chief of state: King GYANENDRA Bir Bikram Shah (succeeded to
the throne 4 June 2001 following the death of his nephew, King
DIPENDRA Bir Bikram Shah)
head of government: Prime Minister Sher Bahadur DEUBA; note - the
Prime Minister resigned in Februrary 2005
cabinet: Cabinet a
|