tions of Minister of Defense and Commander-in-chief of
the Armed Forces
head of government: Prime Minister ABDALLAH bin Khalifa al-Thani,
brother of the monarch (since 30 October 1996); Deputy Prime
Minister MUHAMMAD bin Khalifa al-Thani, brother of the monarch
(since 20 January 1998); First Deputy Prime Minister HAMAD bin JASIM
bin JABIR al-Thani (since 16 September 2003; also Foreign Minister
since 1992); Second Deputy Prime Minister Abdallah bin Hamad
al-ATTIYAH (since 16 September 2003; also Energy Minister since NA
1992)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the monarch
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary
note: in April 2003, Qatar held nationwide elections for a 29-member
Central Municipal Council (CMC), which has consultative powers aimed
at improving the provision of municipal services; the first election
for the CMC was held in March 1999
Reunion
chief of state: President Jacques CHIRAC of France (since 17
May 1995), represented by Prefect Laurent CAYREL (since 16 July 2005)
head of government: President of the General Council Jean-Luc
POUDROUX (since NA March 1998) and President of the Regional Council
Paul VERGES (since NA March 1993)
cabinet: NA
elections: French president elected by popular vote for a five-year
term; prefect appointed by the French president on the advice of the
French Ministry of the Interior; the presidents of the General and
Regional Councils are elected by the members of those councils
Romania
chief of state: President Traian BASESCU (since 20 December
2004)
head of government: Prime Minister Calin Popescu-TARICEANU (since 29
December 2004)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the prime minister
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 28 November 2004, with runoff between the top two
candidates held 12 December 2004 (next to be held 28 November 2009
and 12 December 2009); prime minister appointed by the president
election results: percent of vote - Traian BASESCU 51.23%, Adrian
NASTASE 48.77%
Russia
chief of state: President Vladimir Vladimirovich PUTIN
(acting president since 31 December 1999, president since 7 May 2000)
head of government: Premier Mikhail Yefimovich FRADKOV (since 5
March 2004); Deputy Premier Aleksandr Dmitriyevich ZHUKOV (since 9
March 2004)
cabinet: Ministries of the Government or "Government" composed of
|