atti VANHANEN (since 24 June
2003) and Deputy Prime Minister Eero HEINALUOMA (since 24 September
2005)
cabinet: Council of State or Valtioneuvosto appointed by the
president, responsible to parliament
elections: president elected by popular vote for a six-year term;
election last held 16 January 2000 and 6 February 2000 (next to be
held February 2006); the president appoints the prime minister and
deputy prime minister from the majority party or the majority
coalition after parliamentary elections and the parliament must
approve the appointment
election results: Tarja HALONEN elected president; percent of vote -
Tarja HALONEN (SDP) 51.6%, Esko AHO (Kesk) 48.4%
note: government coalition - Kesk, SDP, and SFP
France
chief of state: President Jacques CHIRAC (since 17 May 1995)
head of government: Prime Minister Dominique DE VILLEPIN (since 31
May 2005)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the president on the
suggestion of the prime minister
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term
(changed from seven-year term in October 2000); election last held
21 April and 5 May 2002 (next to be held, first round April 2007,
second round May 2007); prime minister nominated by the National
Assembly majority and appointed by the president
election results: Jacques CHIRAC reelected president; percent of
vote, second ballot - Jacques CHIRAC (RPR) 81.96%, Jean-Marie LE PEN
(FN) 18.04%
French Guiana
chief of state: President Jacques CHIRAC of France
(since 17 May 1995), represented by Prefect Ange MANCINI (since 31
July 2002)
head of government: President of the General Council Joseph
HO-TEN-YOU (since 26 March 2001); President of the Regional Council
Antoine KARAM (since 22 March 1992)
cabinet: NA
elections: French president elected by popular vote for a five-year
term; prefect appointed by the French president on the advice of the
French Ministry of Interior; presidents of the General and Regional
Councils are appointed by the members of those councils
French Polynesia
chief of state: President Jacques CHIRAC of France
(since 17 May 1995), represented by High Commissioner of the
Republic Michel MATHIEU (since 24 October 2001); note - Michel
MATHIER leaves 30 July 2005, replaced by Jacques MICHAUT (acting
high commissioner), until the arrival of Anne BOQUET in early
September 2005
head of government: Preside
|