f representing state and receiving diplomatic
credentials; SPA appointed PAK Pong Ju Premier
head of government: Premier PAK Pong Ju (since 3 September 2003);
Vice Premiers KWAK Pom Gi (since 5 September 1998), JON Sung Hun
(since 3 September 2003), RO Tu Chol (since 3 September 2003)
cabinet: Cabinet (Naegak), members, except for the Minister of
People's Armed Forces, are appointed by the SPA
elections: election last held in September 2003 (next to be held in
September 2008)
election results: KIM Jong Il and KIM Yong Nam were only nominees
for positions and ran unopposed
Korea, South
chief of state: President ROH Moo-hyun (since 25
February 2003)
head of government: Prime Minister LEE Hae-chan (since 25 May 2004);
Deputy Prime Ministers HAN Duck-soo (14 March 2005), KIM Jin-pyo
(since 28 January 2005), and OH Myung (since 18 October 2004)
cabinet: State Council appointed by the president on the prime
minister's recommendation
elections: president elected by popular vote for single five-year
term; election last held 19 December 2002 (next to be held in
February 2008); prime minister appointed by president with consent
of National Assembly; deputy prime ministers appointed by president
on prime minister's recommendation
election results: results of the 19 December 2002 election - ROH
Moo-hyun elected president; percent of vote - ROH Moo-hyun (MDP)
48.9%; LEE Hoi-chang (GNP) 46.6%; other 4.5%
Kuwait
chief of state: Amir JABIR al-Ahmad al-Jabir al-Sabah (since
31 December 1977); Crown Prince SAAD al-Abdullah al-Salim al-Sabah
head of government: Prime Minister SABAH al-Ahmad al-Jabir al-Sabah
(since 13 July 2003); First Deputy Prime Minister and Minister of
the Interior NAWWAF al-Ahmad al-Sabah (since 2003); Deputy Prime
Ministers JABIR MUBARAK al-Hamad al-Sabah (since 2001) and Muhammad
Dayfallah al-SHARAR (since 2003)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the prime minister and
approved by the monarch
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; prime minister and
deputy prime ministers appointed by the monarch
Kyrgyzstan
chief of state: President Kurmanbek BAKIYEV (since 14
August 2005); note - former President Askar AKAYEV resigned
effective 11 April 2005 following widespread protests that forced
him to flee the country on 24 March 2005
head of government: Prime Minister Feliks KULOV (since 1 September
2005)
cabinet
|