(from Spain)
Constitution:
28 July 1980 (often referred to as the 1979 Constitution because the
Constituent Assembly met in 1979, but the Constitution actually took effect
the following year); suspended 5 April 1992; being revised or replaced
Legal system: based on civil law system; has not accepted compulsory ICJ jurisdiction
National holiday:
Independence Day, 28 July (1821)
Political parties and leaders:
New Majority/Change 90 (Cambio 90), Alberto FUJIMORI; Popular Christian
Party (PPC), Luis BEDOYA Reyes; Popular Action Party (AP), Eduardo CALMELL
del Solar; Liberty Movement (ML), Luis BUSTAMANTE; American Popular
Revolutionary Alliance (APRA), Alan GARCIA; Independent Moralizing Front
(FIM), Fernando OLIVERA Vega; National Renewal, Rafael REY; Democratic
Coordinator, Jose Barba CAHALLERO; Democratic Left Movement, Gloria HOFLER
Other political or pressure groups:
leftist guerrilla groups include Shining Path, Abimael GUZMAN (imprisoned);
Tupac Amaru Revolutionary Movement, Nestor SERPA and Victor POLAY
(imprisoned)
*Peru, Government
Suffrage:
18 years of age; universal
Elections:
President:
last held on 10 June 1990 (next to be held NA April 1995); results - Alberto
FUJIMORI 56.53%, Mario VARGAS Llosa 33.92%, other 9.55%
Democratic Constituent Congress:
last held 25 November 1992 (next to be held NA); seats - (80 total) New
Majority/Change 90 44, Popular Christian Party 8, Independent Moralization
Front 7, Renewal 6, Movement of the Democratic Left 4, Democratic
Coordinator 4, others 7; several major parties (American Popular
Revolutionary Alliance, Popular Action) did not participate
Executive branch:
president, prime minister, Council of Ministers (cabinet)
Legislative branch:
unicameral Democratic Constituent Congress (CCD)
Judicial branch:
Supreme Court of Justice (Corte Suprema de Justicia)
Leaders:
Chief of State:
President Alberto Kenyo FUJIMORI Fujimori (since 28 July 1990)
Head of Government:
Prime Minister Oscar DE LA PUENTE Raygada (since 6 April 1992)
Member of:
AG, CCC, ECLAC, FAO, G-11, G-15, G-19, G-24, G-77, GATT, IADB, IAEA, IBRD,
ICAO, ICFTU, IDA, IFAD, IFC, ILO, IMF, IMO, INMARSAT, INTELSAT, INTERPOL,
IOC, IOM, ISO, ITU, LAES, LAIA, LORCS, MINURSO, NAM, OAS, OPANAL, PCA, RG
(suspended), UN, UNCTAD, UNESCO, UNIDO, UPU, WCL, WFTU, WHO, WIPO, WMO, WTO
Diplomatic representation in US:
chief of mission:
Ambassador Ri
|