consists of 11 federally controlled island groups
with a total of 72 individual islands
Independence:
5 July 1811 (from Spain)
Constitution:
23 January 1961
Legal system:
based on Napoleonic code; judicial review of legislative acts in Cassation
Court only; has not accepted compulsory ICJ jurisdiction
National holiday:
Independence Day, 5 July (1811)
Political parties and leaders:
Social Christian Party (COPEI), Hilarion CARDOZO, president, and Jose
CURIEL, secretary general (acting); Democratic Action (AD), Humberto CELLI,
president, and Luis ALFARO Ucero, secretary general; Movement Toward
Socialism (MAS), Argelia LAYA, president, and Freddy MUNOZ, secretary
general; The Radical Cause ( La Causa R), Pablo Medina, secretary general
Other political or pressure groups:
FEDECAMARAS, a conservative business group; Venezuelan Confederation of
Workers (labor organization dominated by the Democratic Action); VECINOS
groups
Suffrage:
18 years of age; universal
Elections:
President:
last held 4 December 1988 (next to be held 5 December 1993); results -
Carlos Andres PEREZ (AD) 54.6%, Eduardo FERNANDEZ (COPEI) 41.7%, other 3.7%;
note - President Carlos Andres PEREZ suspended pending trial on corruption
charges
Senate:
last held 4 December 1988 (next to be held 5 December 1993); results -
percent of vote by party NA; seats - (49 total) AD 23, COPEI 22, other 4;
note - 3 former presidents (1 from AD, 2 from COPEI) hold lifetime senate
seats
*Venezuela, Government
Chamber of Deputies:
last held 4 December 1992 (next to be held 5 December 1993); results - AD
43.7%, COPEI 31.4%, MAS 10.3%, other 14.6%; seats - (201 total) AD 97, COPEI
67, MAS 18, other 19
Executive branch:
president, Council of Ministers (cabinet)
Legislative branch:
bicameral Congress of the Republic (Congreso de la Republica) consists of an
upper chamber or Senate (Senado) and a lower chamber or Chamber of Deputies
(Camara de Diputados)
Judicial branch:
Supreme Court of Justice (Corte Suprema de Justicia)
Leaders:
Chief of State and Head of Government:
Interim President Ramon Jose VELASQUEZ (since 5 June 1993); note - President
Carlos Andres PEREZ suspended pending trial on corruption charges
Member of: AG, CARICOM (observer), CDB, CG, ECLAC, FAO, G-3, G-11, G-15, G-19, G-24,
G-77, GATT, IADB, IAEA, IBRD, ICAO, ICC, ICFTU, IFAD, IFC, ILO, IMF, IMO,
INTELSAT, INTERPOL, IO
|