People's Congress with a total of 2,937 votes (4 delegates voted
against him, 4 abstained, and 38 did not vote); ZENG Qinghong
elected vice president by the Tenth National People's Congress with
a total of 2,578 votes (177 delegates voted against him, 190
abstained, and 38 did not vote); 2 seats were vacant
Christmas Island
chief of state: Queen ELIZABETH II (since 6
February 1952), represented by the Australian governor general
head of government: Administrator Evan WILLIAMS (since 1 November
2003)
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; administrator appointed
by the governor general of Australia and represents the monarch and
Australia
Cocos (Keeling) Islands
chief of state: Queen ELIZABETH II (since 6
February 1952), represented by the Australian governor general
head of government: Administrator (nonresident) Evan WILLIAMS (since
1 November 2003)
cabinet: NA
elections: none; the monarch is hereditary; administrator appointed
by the governor general of Australia and represents the monarch and
Australia
Colombia
chief of state: President Alvaro URIBE Velez (since 7
August 2002); Vice President Francisco SANTOS (since 7 August 2002);
note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
head of government: President Alvaro URIBE Velez (since 7 August
2002); Vice President Francisco SANTOS (since 7 August 2002); note -
the president is both the chief of state and head of government
cabinet: Cabinet consists of a coalition of the two dominant parties
- the PL and PSC - and independents
elections: president and vice president elected by popular vote for
a four-year term; election last held 26 May 2002 (next to be held NA
May 2006)
election results: President Alvaro URIBE Velez received 53% of the
vote; Vice President Francisco SANTOS was elected on the same ticket
Comoros
chief of state: President AZALI Assoumani (since 26 May
2002); note - following a 1999 coup AZALI was appointed president;
in January 2002 he resigned his position to run in the 14 April 2002
presidential elections; Prime Minister Hamada Madi BOLERO was
appointed interim president until replaced again by AZALI in May
2002 when BOLERO was appointed Minister of External Defense and
Territorial Security; the president is both the chief of state and
the head of government
head of government: President AZALI Assoumani (since 26 May 20
|