% of the vote
Mauritius
chief of state: President Sir Anerood JUGNAUTH (since 7
October 2003) and Vice President Abdool Raouf BUNDHUN (since 25
February 2002)
head of government: Prime Minister Paul BERENGER (since 30 September
2003)
cabinet: Council of Ministers appointed by the president on the
recommendation of the prime minister
elections: president and vice president elected by the National
Assembly for five-year terms; election last held 25 February 2002
(next to be held NA 2007); prime minister and deputy prime minister
appointed by the president, responsible to the National Assembly
election results: Karl OFFMANN elected president and Raouf BUNDHUN
elected vice president; percent of vote by the National Assembly -
NA; note - Karl OFFMANN stepped down on 30 September 2003
Mayotte
chief of state: President Jacques CHIRAC of France (since 17
May 1995), represented by Prefect Jean-Paul KIHL (since 17 January
2005)
head of government: President of the General Council Younoussa
BAMANA (since NA 1977)
cabinet: NA
elections: French president elected by popular vote for a five-year
term; prefect appointed by the French president on the advice of the
French Ministry of the Interior; president of the General Council
elected by the members of the General Council for a six-year term
Mexico
chief of state: President Vicente FOX Quesada (since 1
December 2000); note - the president is both the chief of state and
head of government
head of government: President Vicente FOX Quesada (since 1 December
2000); note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president; note - appointment of
attorney general requires consent of the Senate
elections: president elected by popular vote for a six-year term;
election last held 2 July 2000 (next to be held 2 July 2006)
election results: Vicente FOX Quesada elected president; percent of
vote - Vicente FOX Quesada (PAN) 42.52%, Francisco LABASTIDA Ochoa
(PRI) 36.1%, Cuauhtemoc CARDENAS Solorzano (PRD) 16.64%, other 4.74%
Micronesia, Federated States of
chief of state: President Joseph J.
URUSEMAL (since 11 May 2003); Vice President Redley KILLION (11 May
2003); note - the president is both the chief of state and head of
government
head of government: President Joseph J. URUSEMAL (since 11 May
2003); Vice President Redley KILLION (11 M
|