ava, Teleorman, Timis, Tulcea, Vaslui, Vilcea, Vrancea
Independence:
1881 (from Turkey); republic proclaimed 30 December 1947
Constitution:
8 December 1991
Legal system:
former mixture of civil law system and Communist legal theory that
increasingly reflected Romanian traditions is being revised
National holiday:
National Day of Romania, 1 December (1990)
Executive branch:
*** No entry for this item ***
president, prime minister, Council of Ministers (cabinet)
Legislative branch:
bicameral Parliament consists of an upper house or Senate (Senat) and a
lower house or House of Deputies (Adunarea Deputatilor)
Judicial branch:
Supreme Court of Justice
Leaders:
Chief of State:
President Ion ILIESCU (since 20 June 1990, previously President of
Provisional Council of National Unity since 23 December 1989)
Head of Government:
Prime Minister Teodor STOLOJAN (since 2 October 1991)
Political parties and leaders:
National Salvation Front (FSN), Petre ROMAN; Democratuc National Salvation
Front (DNSF), Olivia GHERMAN; Magyar Democratic Union (UDMR), Geza DOMOKOS;
National Liberal Party (PNL), Radu CAMPEANU; National Peasants' Christian
and Democratic Party (PNTCD), Corneliu COPOSU; Ecology Movement (MER), Toma
Gheorghe MAIORESCU; Romanian National Unity Party (PUNR), Radu CEONTEA;
there are now more than 100 other parties; note - although the Communist
Party has ceased to exist, small proto-Communist parties, notably the
Socialist Labor Party, have been formed
Suffrage:
universal at age 18
Elections:
President:
last held 20 May 1990 (next to be held NA 1992); results - Ion ILIESCU 85%,
Radu CAMPEANU 10.5%, Ion RATIU 3.8%
Senate:
last held 20 May 1990 (next to be held NA 1992); results - FSN 67%, other
33%; seats - (118 total) FSN 92, UDMR 12, PNL 9, PUNR 2, PNTCD 1, MER 1,
other 1
House of Deputies:
last held 20 May 1990 (next to be held NA 1992); results - FSN 66%, UDMR 7%,
PNL 6%, MER 2%, PNTCD 2%, PUNR 2%, other 15%; seats - (387 total) FSN 263,
UDMR 29, PNL 29, PNTCD 12, MER 12, PUNR 9, other 33
:Romania Government
Member of:
BIS, CCC, CSCE, ECE, FAO, G-9, G-77, GATT, IAEA, IBEC, IBRD, ICAO, IFAD,
IFC, IIB, ILO, IMF, IMO, INTERPOL, IOC, ITU, LORCS, NAM (guest), PCA, UN,
UNCTAD, UNESCO, UNIDO, UPU, WFTU, WHO, WIPO, WMO, WTO
Diplomatic representation:
Ambassador Aurel M
|