on referred to, Mr John Kemp,
Trinity-Gask, acted as Clerk till 12th September, 1775, when he was
thanked for the care and attention with which he had discharged the
duties of that office.
1775-1776--DAVID DAVIDSON, assistant at Monzie, appointed 12th
September, 1775, "during the pleasure of the Presbytery and his own
good behaviour." One of Mr Walker's assistants. Resigned 7th May,
1776, on being admitted as minister of Kippen.
1776-1784--ALEX. COLDSTREAM, schoolmaster of Crieff, appointed
unanimously 7th May, 1776. He never seems to have recorded a single
minute of Presbytery in the register, but to have left them all in
scroll. On 7th August, 1784, a motion was made by a member of
Presbytery that, considering the many proofs of indolence and
incapacity which their Clerk has given in the above business of Mr
Lawson, and other matters belonging to his office, that he be no longer
continued therein. Consideration of this motion was delayed till next
meeting (2nd Nov., 1784), when it was unanimously agreed to.
1784-1792--ANDREW DUNCAN, minister of Auchterarder, appointed 2nd
November, 1784. On 3rd July, 1792, he intimated to the Presbytery
that, having now completed the register of the Presbytery, which had
been ten years behind the minute-book, and brought it up to the present
date, the doing of which was one object of his undertaking the
Clerkship, he now begged to resign that office.
1792-1819--JOHN BROWN, minister of Glendevon, appointed 3rd July, 1792.
Held office for long period of twenty-seven years. Was also for many
years Clerk of Synod. Resigned (8th June, 1819) the Presbytery
Clerkship, thanking them for "the support and assistance they had
always given him in the execution of his duty as their Clerk." At same
time he nominated as his successor, Mr Robert John Robertson, minister
of Gask, "a gentleman whose candour, fidelity, and talents much
recommend him to the notice of all that know him, and qualify him
particularly to the office of Clerk of the Presbytery."
1819-1822--ROBERT JOHN ROBERTSON, minister of Gask, appointed
unanimously on 8th June, 1819; resigned 2nd July, 1822, on his
translation to Forteviot.
1822-1829--JOHN EDWARD TOUCH, minister of Madderty, appointed
unanimously 2nd July, 1822; resigned 1st September, 1829, on his
translation to Kinnoull, and was thanked for his "attention, fidelity,
diligence, and accuracy."
1829-1833--JOHN MACFARLANE, minister of Ardoch Chapel, a
|