eco (since
28 July 2001) and Second Vice President David WAISMAN (since 28 July
2001) note: Prime Minister Roberto DANINO (since 28 July 2001) does not
exercise executive power; this power is in the hands of the president
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
special presidential and congressional elections held 8 April 2001,
with runoff election held 3 June 2001; next to be held 9 April 2006
election results: President Alejandro TOLEDO Manrique elected president
in runoff election; percent of vote - Alejandro TOLEDO Manrique 53.1%,
Alan GARCIA 46.9% cabinet: Legislative branch: unicameral Congress of
the Republic of Peru or Congresso de la Republica del Peru (120 seats;
members are elected by popular vote to serve five-year terms) election
results: percent of vote by party - Peru Posible 26.3%, APRA 19.7%,
Unidad Nacional 13.8%, FIM 11.0%, others 29.2%; seats by party - Peru
Posible 47, APRA 28, Unidad Nacional 17, FIM 11, others 17 elections:
last held 8 April 2001 (next to be held 9 April 2006)
Judicial branch: Supreme Court of Justice or Corte Suprema de Justicia
(judges are appointed by the National Council of the Judiciary)
Political parties and leaders: American Popular Revolutionary Alliance
or APRA [Alan GARCIA]; Independent Moralizing Front or FIM [Fernando
OLIVERA Vega]; National Unity (Unidad Nacional) or UN [Lourdes FLORES
Nano]; Peru Posible or PP [Luis SOLARI]; Popular Action or AP [Javier
DIAZ Orihuela]; Solucion Popular [Carlos BOLANA]; Somos Peru or SP
[Alberto ANDRADE]; Union for Peru or UPP [Roger GUERRA Garcia]
Political pressure groups and leaders: leftist guerrilla groups include
Shining Path [Abimael GUZMAN Reynoso (imprisoned), Gabriel MACARIO
(top leader at-large)]; Tupac Amaru Revolutionary Movement or MRTA
[Victor POLAY (imprisoned), Hugo AVALLENEDA Valdez (top leader at-large)]
International organization participation: ABEDA, APEC, CAN, CCC, ECLAC,
FAO, G-15, G-19, G-24, G-77, IADB, IAEA, IBRD, ICAO, ICC, ICFTU, ICRM,
IDA, IFAD, IFC, IFRCS, IHO, ILO, IMF, IMO, Interpol, IOC, IOM, ISO
(correspondent), ITU, LAES, LAIA, MONUC, NAM, OAS, OPANAL, OPCW, PCA,
RG, UN, UNCTAD, UNESCO, UNIDO, UNMEE, UPU, WCL, WFTU, WHO, WIPO, WMO,
WToO, WTrO
Diplomatic representation in the US: chief of mission: Ambassador Allan
WAGNER chancery: 1700 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20036
consulate(s) general: Boston, Chicago, Denver, Houston, Los Angeles,
Miami, New
|