assumed presidency after resignation of President
Janet JAGAN and reelected in 2001, and again in 2006
head of government: Prime Minister Samuel HINDS (since October 1992,
except for a period as chief of state after the death of President
Cheddi JAGAN on 6 March 1997)
cabinet: Cabinet of Ministers appointed by the president,
responsible to the legislature
elections: president elected by popular vote as leader of a party
list in parliamentary elections, which must be held at least every
five years (no term limits); elections last held 28 August 2006
(next to be held by August 2011); prime minister appointed by the
president
election results: President Bharrat JAGDEO reelected; percent of
vote 54.6%
Haiti
chief of state: President Rene PREVAL (since 14 May 2006)
head of government: Prime Minister Jacques-Edouard ALEXIS (since 30
May 2006)
cabinet: Cabinet chosen by the prime minister in consultation with
the president
elections: president elected by popular vote for a five-year term
(may not serve consecutive terms); election last held 7 February
2006 (next to be held in 2010); prime minister appointed by the
president, ratified by the National Assembly
election results: Rene PREVAL elected president; percent of vote -
Rene PREVAL 51%
Holy See (Vatican City)
chief of state: Pope BENEDICT XVI (since 19
April 2005)
head of government: Secretary of State Cardinal Tarcisio BERTONE
(since 15 September 2006)
cabinet: Pontifical Commission appointed by the pope
elections: pope elected for life by the College of Cardinals;
election last held 19 April 2005 (next to be held after the death of
the current pope); secretary of state appointed by the pope
election results: Joseph RATZINGER elected Pope BENEDICT XVI
Honduras
chief of state: President Manuel ZELAYA Rosales (since 27
January 2006); First Vice President Elvin Ernesto SANTOS Ordonez
(since 27 January 2006); Second Vice President (vacant); Third Vice
President (vacant); note - the president is both the chief of state
and head of government
head of government: President Manuel ZELAYA Rosales (since 27
January 2006); First Vice President Elvin Ernesto SANTOS Ordonez
(since 27 January 2006); Second Vice President (vacant); Third Vice
President (vacant)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by president
elections: president elected by popular vote for a four-year term;
election last h
|