based on English common law and Islamic law; as of 20
January 1991, the now defunct Revolutionary Command Council imposed
Islamic law in the northern states; Islamic law applies to all
residents of the northern states regardless of their religion; some
separate religious courts; accepts compulsory ICJ jurisdiction, with
reservations
Suffrage: NA years of age; universal, but noncompulsory
Executive branch:
chief of state : President Lt. General Umar Hasan Ahmad al-BASHIR
(since 16 October 1993); First Vice President Major General al-Zubayr
Muhammad SALIH (since 19 October 1993), Second Vice President (Police)
Maj. General George KONGOR AROP (since NA February 1994); note - the
president is both the chief of state and head of government
head of government : President Lt. General Umar Hasan Ahmad al-BASHIR
(since 16 October 1993); First Vice President Major General al-Zubayr
Muhammad SALIH (since 19 October 1993), Second Vice President (Police)
Maj. General George KONGOR AROP (since NA February 1994); note - the
president is both the chief of state and head of government
cabinet : Cabinet appointed by the president; note - President
al-BASHIR's government is dominated by members of Sudan's National
Islamic Front, a fundamentalist political organization formed from the
Muslim Brotherhood in 1986; front leader Hasan al-TURABI dominates
much of Khartoum's overall domestic and foreign policies; President
al-BASHIR named a new cabinet on 20 April 1996 which includes members
of the National Islamic Front, serving and retired military offficers,
and civilian technocrats
elections : president elected by popular vote for a five-year term;
election last held 6-17 March 1996 (next to be held NA 2001)
election results: Umar Hasan Ahmad al-BASHIR elected president;
percent of vote - Umar Hasan Ahmad al-BASHIR 75.7%; note - about forty
other candidates ran for president
note : al-BASHIR, as chairman of the Revolutionary Command Council for
National Salvation (RCC), assumed power on 30 June 1989 and served
concurrently as chief of state, chairman of the RCC, prime minister,
and minister of defense until 16 October 1993 when he was appointed
president by the RCC; upon its dissolution on 16 October 1993, the
RCC's executive and legislative powers were devolved to the president
and the Transitional National Assembly (TNA), Sudan's appointed
legislative body, which has since been replaced by the National
Assembly which was elected in
|