l 2006); note - the president and vice presidents comprise the
Presidency Council)
head of government: Prime Minister Nuri al-MALIKI (since 20 May
2006); Deputy Prime Ministers Barham SALIH (since 20 May 2006)and
Rafi al-ISSAWI (since 19 July 2008)
cabinet: 34 ministers appointed by the Presidency Council, plus
Prime Minister Nuri al-MALIKI and Deputy Prime Ministers Barham
SALIH and Rafi al-ISSAWI
elections: held 15 December 2005 to elect a 275-member Council of
Representatives
Ireland
chief of state: President Mary MCALEESE (since 11 November
1997)
head of government: Prime Minister Brian COWEN (since 7 May 2008)
cabinet: Cabinet appointed by the president with previous nomination
by the prime minister and approval of the House of Representatives
elections: president elected by popular vote for a seven-year term
(eligible for a second term); election last held 31 October 1997
(next scheduled for October 2011); note - Mary MCALEESE appointed to
a second term when no other candidate qualified for the 2004
presidential election; prime minister (taoiseach) nominated by the
House of Representatives and appointed by the president
election results: Mary MCALEESE elected president; percent of vote -
Mary MCALEESE 44.8%, Mary BANOTTI 29.6%
note: government coalition - Fianna Fail, the Green Party, the
Progressive Democrats, and independent members of Parliament
Isle of Man
chief of state: Lord of Mann Queen ELIZABETH II (since 6
February 1952); represented by Lieutenant Governor Sir Paul K.
HADDACKS (since 17 October 2005)
head of government: Chief Minister Tony BROWN (since 14 December
2006)
cabinet: Council of Ministers
elections: the monarch is hereditary; lieutenant governor appointed
by the monarch for a five-year term; the chief minister is elected
by the Tynwald; election last held 14 December 2006 (next to be held
in December 2008)
election results: House of Keys speaker Tony BROWN elected chief
minister by the Tynwald
Israel
chief of state: President Shimon PERES (since 15 July 2007)
head of government: Prime Minister Ehud OLMERT (since May 2006);
Deputy Prime Minister Tzipora "Tzipi" LIVNI; note - Prime Minister
OLMERT resigned on 17 September 2008, but will serve as acting prime
minister until a new government is formed
cabinet: Cabinet selected by prime minister and approved by the
Knesset
elections: president is
|